Global Patent Index - EP 1088767 A1

EP 1088767 A1 2001-04-04 - Bag made of a resilient material containing a voluminous material and stack of bags

Title (en)

Bag made of a resilient material containing a voluminous material and stack of bags

Title (de)

Ein voluminöses Material enthaltender Sack aus flexiblem Material und Säckestapel

Title (fr)

Sac réalisé dans une matière souple contenant un matériau volumineux et empilement de sacs

Publication

EP 1088767 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00490035 A

Priority

FR 9912097 A

Abstract (en)

The carrier bag for heavy bulk materials has a flexible bag (1) of plastics and formed as a parallelepiped. The bag is closed on two sides by heat welds (2,3). Along one longitudinal side the bag has two carrier handles (12) extending transversely between the weld zones. The handles can be at the same distance from the heat weld seams. There can be two pairs of handles.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention se rapporte à un sac (1) réalisé dans une matière souple, de préférence en matière plastique, contenant un matériau volumineux, notamment du terreau, lequel sac est de forme globalement parallélépipédique et refermé selon deux côtés opposés par des zones transversales de soudure (2,3). Il est caractérisé en ce qu'il comporte, au long d'un côté longitudinal, deux poignées de portage (12) disposées transversalement entre les deux zones de soudure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/06; B65D 75/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/56 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088767 A1 20010404; FR 2798907 A1 20010330; FR 2798907 B1 20020927

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011123

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ORGANISATION INTERNATIONALE DES ACHATS

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010407

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI