Global patent index - EP 1088769 A1

EP 1088769 A1 2001-04-04 - Child resistant container

Title (en)

Child resistant container

Title (de)

Kindersicherer Behälter

Title (fr)

Emballage résistant aux enfants

Publication

EP 1088769 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99119508 A

Priority

EP 99119508 A

Abstract (en)

A child-resistant compact or tablet case (10) of one-piece molded plastic construction made up of a generally flat rectangular base (12) and a cover top (14) interconnected by an integral "living" hinge (16). Each front edge flange (24,26) has an arcuate recess (28,30), and these recesses are mutually offset from each other laterally of the case (10) when it is closed with the flanges (24,26) lying against one another. The base (12) has a pair of latch spring fingers (36,38) disposed one on each of the laterally opposed sides near the front edge of the base (12) and that protrude upwardly from the base bottom wall (18) in cantilever fashion. The top (56) has a cooperating pair of pockets (40,42) that receive the free latch-tang ends (44) of the spring fingers (36,38) to render them exterior-accessible in the closed condition of the case (10). The outer edges of these pockets (40,42) form the strike portion of the latch system. To open the case (10), squeeze pressure must be applied with one hand simultaneously to both of the spring finger tang ends (44) to move them to unlatched condition, and then to hold them in this condition while, also simultaneously, with the other hand pry-open pressure is applied to the two front lip flanges (24,26) at the aforementioned offset recesses (28,30). This two-handed operation further resists opening by a child because of its complex dual-hand-manipulative coordination requirement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 43/16; B65D 50/04; B65D 83/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/16 (2006.01); B65D 50/04 (2006.01); B65D 83/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 50/045 (2013.01); B65D 43/162 (2013.01); B65D 83/0463 (2013.01); B65D 2251/1016 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088769 A1 20010404; EP 1088769 B1 20061115; DE 69934006 D1 20061228; DE 69934006 T2 20070628; ES 2275326 T3 20070601

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101002

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69934006

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091117

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2008-10-31 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2007-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2275326

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69934006

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-12-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2006-11-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031002

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI