Global Patent Index - EP 1088773 A2

EP 1088773 A2 2001-04-04 - Large receptacle with a closable upper lid

Title (en)

Large receptacle with a closable upper lid

Title (de)

Grossbehälter mit verschliessbarem oberen Deckel

Title (fr)

Récipient à grande capacité avec couvercle obturable superieur

Publication

EP 1088773 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121093 A

Priority

DE 19947492 A

Abstract (en)

The container has at least one upper opening closable by at least one lid (2,3) and a lid blocking part (6), especially a pivotable yoke. A control part (14) movably mounted on the container rests on a base (17) on which the container stands and moves down when the container is raised and thereby protrudes down beyond the underside of the container. The control part is connected to the blocking part via a transfer arrangement (10,11a,11b,12).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Großbehälter (1) insbesondere zur Entsorgung von Abfall mit mindestens einer an der Oberseite angeordnetem, durch mindestens einen Deckel (2,3) verschließbaren Öffnung, wobei der Deckel von einem Sperrteil (6) insbesondere einem verschwenkbaren Bügel sperrbar ist, der in seiner Verschlußstellung im Verschwenkweg des geschlossenen Deckels und in seiner Offenstellung außerhalb des Verschwenkwegs liegt. Am Behälter ist ein Steuerteil (14) beweglich gelagert, das am Untergrund (17) anliegt, auf dem der Behälter steht. Das Steuerteil bewegt sich beim Anheben des Behälters nach unten und steht hierbei nach unten über die Behälterunterseite vor. Das Steuerteil ist durch Übertragungsmittel (10,11,12) mit dem Sperrteil verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1607 (2013.01); B65F 1/1615 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088773 A2 20010404; EP 1088773 A3 20020717; DE 19947492 A1 20010405

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050401

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021210

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20000928

- Countries: SI

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000928

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000928