Global Patent Index - EP 1088780 A3

EP 1088780 A3 2002-09-04 - Device for selectively closing blow orifices in guiding devices or bars for printed material in rotary printing machines

Title (en)

Device for selectively closing blow orifices in guiding devices or bars for printed material in rotary printing machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum wahlweisen Verschleissen von Blasöffnungen in Bedruckstoff führenden Leiteinrichtungen oder Stangen von Rotationsdruckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour fermer sélectivement des orifice de soufflage dans dispositifs de guidage ou barres pour le support à imprimer dans machines d'impression rotatives

Publication

EP 1088780 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00119327 A

Priority

US 41004199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1088780A2] The selective closure device has a flat element (134,136) for covering the opening that is held by magnetic force. The device is triangular and matches the section of the guide or rod not covered by the print material. The device can be made in strip form and is made of magnetic material and the openings are enclosed by magnetisable material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/06 (2006.01); B41F 13/56 (2006.01); B65H 23/32 (2006.01); B65H 45/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/32 (2013.01); B65H 2301/3423 (2013.01); B65H 2406/111 (2013.01); B65H 2406/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088780 A2 20010404; EP 1088780 A3 20020904; DE 10044070 A1 20010426; JP 2001145993 A 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI