Global Patent Index - EP 1088879 A1

EP 1088879 A1 2001-04-04 - Process for the production of gasolines with improved octane number

Title (en)

Process for the production of gasolines with improved octane number

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Benzin mit verbesserter Oktanzahl

Title (fr)

Procédé de production d'essences à indice d'octane amélioré

Publication

EP 1088879 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402632 A

Priority

FR 9912337 A

Abstract (en)

The process is operated with a charge comprising mainly straight chain paraffins obtained from a Fischer-Tropsch synthesis to produce high octane gasolines, middle distillates and oils. The process comprises the following stages :- a) Conversion with simultaneous hydrotreatment of the paraffins in the charge ; the charge has a S content less than 1000 ppm, N content less than 200 ppm, metal content less than 50 ppm and O2 content less than 0.2 %.The stage is operated at 200 - 500 degrees C., 5 - 25 MPa, and VVH of 0.1-5 h<->1 in the presence of a catalyst containing a noble metal on an acidic amorphous support ; from the effluent obtained, a petrol cut and residue comprising compounds boiling at more than 340 degrees C. are separated off ; b) Separation of the isoparaffins from the petrol cut obtained and recovery of an effluent containing n-paraffins ; c) Isomerisation of the effluent from (b) by contact with a catalyst containing a hydro-dehydrogenating metal an acid solid in the presence of hydrogen to produce an effluent containing isoparaffins of improved octane index ; b<1>) Catalytic de-paraffination of the residue with a catalyst comprising a molecular sieve with a microporous system consisting of channels with pore openings having 9 or 10 atoms T(T is Si, Al, P, B, Ti, Fe or Ga), alternating with an equal number of O atoms ; the distance between two pore openings accessible to 9 or 10 T atoms is no more than 0.75 nm and the product presents a ratio 2-methylnonane /5-methylnonane greater than 5 in the n-decane test.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé pour la production d'essences à indice d'octane amélioré, accompagné éventuellement de production d'huiles et/ou de distillats moyens, par conversion - hydroisomérisation des paraffines de la charge sur un catalyseur contenant au moins un métal noble déposé sur un support acide amorphe. Sur la coupe essence obtenue les isoparaffines sont séparées et les paraffines normales et éventuellement les paraffines monobranchées contenues dans l'effluent résultant sont isomérisées sur un catalyseur contenant au moins un métal hydro-déshydrogérant et au moins un solide acide. L'ensemble des flux chargés en isoparaffines présentant un indice d'octane amélioré est envoyé au pool essence. Le résidu subit un déparaffinage catalytique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 67/06; C10G 67/00; C10G 67/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 29/67 (2006.01); B01J 29/74 (2006.01); B01J 35/10 (2006.01); C10G 25/00 (2006.01); C10G 31/09 (2006.01); C10G 35/085 (2006.01); C10G 45/62 (2006.01); C10G 45/64 (2006.01); C10G 47/14 (2006.01); C10G 65/04 (2006.01); C10G 65/12 (2006.01); C10G 67/02 (2006.01); C10G 67/06 (2006.01); C10L 1/06 (2006.01); C10L 10/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 67/02 (2013.01); C10G 65/043 (2013.01); C10G 65/12 (2013.01); C10G 67/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB GR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088879 A1 20010404; BR 0004550 A 20010417; FR 2799202 A1 20010406; FR 2799202 B1 20020426; JP 2001146592 A 20010529; KR 100695183 B1 20070319; KR 20010088289 A 20010926; US 6436278 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120403

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031229

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB GR IT NL

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011004

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB GR IT NL

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI