Global Patent Index - EP 1088902 A1

EP 1088902 A1 2001-04-04 - Process for manufacturing aging-resistant aluminium killed steel strip

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing aging-resistant aluminium killed steel strip

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Erzeugen von alterungsbeständigen Bändern aus einem aluminiumberuhigten Stahl

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de bandes d'acier calmé à l'aluminium et résistant au vieillissement

Publication

EP 1088902 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116928 A

Priority

DE 19946889 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19946889C1] Aging resistant aluminum-killed steel strip production comprises: subjecting conventionally rolled strip to continuous annealing, hot coiling, cooling to room temperature and skin pass rolling.

Abstract (de)

Um ein kostengünstig und zeitsparend durchführbares Verfahren zum Erzeugen von alterungsbeständigen aus einem aluminiumberuhigten Stahl bestehenden Bändern anzugeben, bei dem zunächst in üblicher Weise ein Band durch Walzen hergestellt und das gewalzte Band durchlaufgeglüht wird, wird das noch erwärmte Band dann zu einem Coil gewickelt und das zu einem Coil gewickelte Band auf Raumtemperatur abgekühlt, wobei das im Coil abgekühlte Band schließlich dressiert wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/04; C21D 9/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/46 (2006.01); C21D 1/26 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01); C21D 9/52 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/0242 (2013.01); C21D 8/0273 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19946889 C1 20001109; EP 1088902 A1 20010404; JP 2001140023 A 20010522; US 6391126 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030906

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010329

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI