Global Patent Index - EP 1088923 A2

EP 1088923 A2 2001-04-04 - Warp knitting machine with needle presser pattern device

Title (en)

Warp knitting machine with needle presser pattern device

Title (de)

Kettenwirkmaschine mit Musterpresse

Title (fr)

Métier à tricoter chaîne à dispositif de dessin presse-aiguilles

Publication

EP 1088923 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120354 A

Priority

DE 19946859 A

Abstract (en)

A warp knitting machine, comprises a piezoelectric bending transducer having a fixed end, distal to a corresponding pressing element, and a free end, proximate to the corresponding pressing element. The free end is displaceable between a first position where press contact occurs, and a second direction in response to the extension of the free end in the longitudinal direction. A warp knitting machine, comprises bearded needles (5), a pattern press, and piezoelectric bending transducers (22). Each bearded needle has a hook (19), and the pattern press includes a driven press bar (10), and individually and selectively controllable pressing elements (26). Each pressing element is aligned with a corresponding needle for contacting the hook. Each piezoelectric bending transducer has a fixed end distal to a corresponding pressing element, and a free end (25), proximate to the corresponding pressing element. The free end extends in a longitudinal direction toward the corresponding pressing element and displaces in a direction transverse to the longitudinal direction between a first position where press contact occurs and a second direction.

Abstract (de)

Eine Kettenwirkmaschine mit Spitznadeln (5) und einer Musterpresse weist eine angetriebene Preßbarre (10) und einzelne Preßelemente (46) auf. Diese sind so steuerbar, daß sie beim Arbeitshub (47) der Preßbarre (10) wahlweise einen Preßkontakt mit dem Haken (19) der zugehörigen Spitznadeln (5) ausüben oder nicht. Jedem Preßelement (46) ist ein einseitig eingespannter piezoelektrischer Biegewandler (42) zugeordnet, dessen freies Ende (45) in Richtung der Nadelfontur aus einer ersten Stellung, in der beim Arbeitshub (47) ein Preßkontakt erfolgt, in eine zweite Stellung, in der das Preßelement (46) oder ein ihm vorgeschaltetes Kraftübertragungselement in Richtung der Nadelfontur ausgelenkt ist, verlagerbar ist. Auf diese Weise ergibt sich eine einfach aufgebaute und für hohe Geschwindigkeiten geeignete Musterpresse. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 23/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 23/16 (2006.01); D04B 23/24 (2006.01); D04B 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 27/04 (2013.01); D04B 23/24 (2013.01); D04B 27/08 (2013.01); D04B 35/02 (2013.01); D04B 35/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088923 A2 20010404; EP 1088923 A3 20010905; CN 1290774 A 20010411; DE 19946859 A1 20010906; DE 19946859 C2 20031204; JP 2001131850 A 20010515; KR 100373907 B1 20030226; KR 20010050653 A 20010615; TW 509234 U 20021101; US 6253583 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040217

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010804

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI