Global Patent Index - EP 1088933 A2

EP 1088933 A2 2001-04-04 - Semi-permeable membrane with interconnected pores for a press

Title (en)

Semi-permeable membrane with interconnected pores for a press

Title (de)

Semipermeable Membran mit miteinander in Verbindung stehenden Poren für eine Presse

Title (fr)

Membrane semiperméable avec pores interconnectés pour une presse

Publication

EP 1088933 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120661 A

Priority

  • DE 19946984 A
  • DE 19946982 A
  • US 40979499 A

Abstract (en)

To extract water from a wet web (12), of paper or cardboard, it is passed through a water extraction zone (E) which is divided into a number of sections (E1-E3) in succession on the direction of web travel (L). Each section has an individually set gas pressure. For the extraction of water from a wet paper/cardboard web, the web is passed through the water extraction zone together with a membrane (16). Gas pressures (14) are applied to the membrane, to displace it against the web. The web is supported by a blanket (18) through the water extraction zone, on the opposite side of the web to the membrane.. The leading water extraction section has a lower gas pressure than in the following section. The final section has a low gas pressure, to maintain the relatively high web volume. An independent claim is included for an assembly to extract water from a wet paper/cardboard web, where the web is carried through a water extraction zone with sections of individually set gas pressures to bear against a membrane on one side of the web. A blanket moves through the zone with the web, at its under side.

Abstract (de)

Eine einheitliche Membran zur Verwendung in einer Preßvorrichtung umfaßt zwei sich in Längsrichtung erstreckende Randabschnitte und einen semipermeablen Abschnitt mit einer Vielzahl von miteinander in Verbindung stehenden Poren. Der semipermeable Abschnitt ist zwischen den beiden sich in Längsrichtung erstreckenden Randabschnitten angeordnet, wobei die einheitliche Membran ein Formgewebe umfaßt und eine Dicke aufweist, die kleiner als ungefähr 2,54 mm (0,1 Zoll) ist. Der semipermeable Abschnitt weist eine Permeabilität auf, die größer als Null und kleiner als ungefähr 0,025 m/s (fünf CFM pro Quadratfuß) ist, wie durch das TAPPI-Testverfahren TIP 0404-20 gemessen. Ein Verfahren zum Herstellen der einheitlichen Membran umfaßt die Schritte, daß ein Trägergewebe bereitgestellt wird, das sehr permeabel ist, und eine Vielzahl von miteinander in Verbindung stehenden Poren in dem Trägergewebe gebildet wird.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0254 (2013.01); D21F 3/0263 (2013.01); D21F 3/0272 (2013.01); D21F 3/029 (2013.01); D21F 3/045 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • PAPERI JA PUU: "Displacement dewatering to maintain bulk", vol. 3, 1992, article J.D. LINDSAY
  • W. KAWKA/E SZWARCZTAJN: "Some results of investigations on the equipment for intensive dewatering and drying of porous papers", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE EUCEPA-79, PAPER 31, 1979, LONDON, pages 153
  • PAPERI JA PUU: "High vacuum dewatering on a paper machine wire secion- on a literature revieuw", vol. 78, 1996, article KARI ROISONEN, 3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088933 A2 20010404; EP 1088933 A3 20020821; EP 1088933 B1 20050406; DE 50013312 D1 20060921; DE 50013339 D1 20060928; DE 50013759 D1 20061228; EP 1362948 A1 20031119; EP 1362948 B1 20060809; EP 1362949 A1 20031119; EP 1362949 B1 20060816; EP 1362950 A1 20031119; EP 1362950 B1 20061115

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100922

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50009970

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100921

2011-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090915

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060110

2005-07-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009970

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-05-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2002-11-27 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-17 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17P

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020426

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI