Global Patent Index - EP 1088934 A2

EP 1088934 A2 2001-04-04 - Pressing apparatus with membrane

Title (en)

Pressing apparatus with membrane

Title (de)

Pressenvorrichtung mit einer Membrane

Title (fr)

Dispositif de presse avec une membrane

Publication

EP 1088934 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00121132 A

Priority

  • US 40928799 A
  • US 40979499 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for processing a continuous web having a first side and a second side includes a plurality of rollers are arranged for cooperative rotation. The plurality of rollers are positioned to define a corresponding plurality of nips. The continuous web is processed through at least two of the plurality of nips. At least a first roller of the plurality of rollers has at least one void formed in the cylindrical middle surface. First and second sealing panels engage first and second circular ends of each of the plurality of rollers and define a chamber. A first pressure source is fluidly coupled to the chamber to pressurize the chamber. A membrane is positioned adjacent the first side of the continuous web to separate the continuous web from direct communication with the chamber. The membrane is structured and adapted to have a permeability which permits a predetermined fluid flow therethrough to the continuous web, and structured and adapted for communicating with the pressurized chamber and the at least one void to apply a mechanical pressing force to the continuous web. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0254 (2013.01); D21F 3/0263 (2013.01); D21F 3/0272 (2013.01); D21F 3/029 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088934 A2 20010404; EP 1088934 A3 20030312; EP 1088934 B1 20060809; AT 335878 T 20060915; DE 60029892 D1 20060921; DE 60029892 T2 20070215

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60029892

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120928

2013-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 335878 T

- Effective date: 20120928

2013-04-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120928

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120929

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070510

2006-11-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60029892 P 20060921

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-01-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-12-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2003-12-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI