Global Patent Index - EP 1088943 A2

EP 1088943 A2 2001-04-04 - Mounting support system with installation aid

Title (en)

Mounting support system with installation aid

Title (de)

Montageträgersystem mit Einbauhilfe

Title (fr)

Support de montage avec accessoire de montage

Publication

EP 1088943 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121185 A

Priority

DE 29917220 U

Abstract (en)

The deformable holding element (35) holds the pressure disk (31) on the anchor (33) in a pre-set design position and consists (35) of a U-spring having legs fixed to the disk and legs joined by a crosspiece thrusting off an endstop (34) on the anchor end so as to hold the disk to the specified endstop (34). Otherwise, holding is effected by a flexible distance piece of spring sheet whose crosspiece thrusts off a radial stop of the anchor (33), or again on a coupling counterpart (12) which is fixed on the projecting anchor end and can be coupled to the coupling element (7) of the connecting element (1). The anchor in this case (33) passes through a hole in the spacer (35) crosspiece so as to force the disk (31) onto the anchor endstop (34). The holding element can again be a flexible sleeve passing round the disk, endstop and/or tie anchor at one end, the sleeve preferably shrunk onto the endstop. In a variant, the holding element is a plate spring structure having conical and adjoining cylindrical sectors bearing on the circumference of the anchor with the conical sector composed of several straps bent radially outwards to go integrally over into the cylindrical sector. The ends of the straps make up a flange to bear on the disk (31). This spring design reaches through the disk bore towards the anchor endstop (34) and is secured there to the tie anchor (33).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Montageträgersystem für das Montieren eines Fertigbauteils (6) an einem Gebäudeteil (9), mit den folgenden Montageelementen: Einem Zuganker (33), an den ein am Fertigungsbauteil angeordnetes Anschlußelement (1) koppelbar ist und der mit einem im Gebäudeteil (9) gehaltenen Widerlager (42) über einen Ankeranschlag (34) sowie eine zwischengefügte Druckscheibe (31) in Eingriff bringbar ist, welche beweglich auf dem Zuganker (33) gelagert ist. Das erfindungsgemäße Montageträgersystem hat ferner eine Vorrichtung zur Sicherstellung einer vorbestimmten Relativlage zweier der Montageelemente. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/00 (2006.01); E04B 5/43 (2006.01); E04C 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/0038 (2013.01); E04B 5/43 (2013.01); E04C 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29917220 U1 20000113; DE 19949839 C1 20001130; EP 1088943 A2 20010404; EP 1088943 A3 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 04B 1/00 A

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 04C 5/16 B

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI