Global Patent Index - EP 1088943 A3

EP 1088943 A3 2003-06-18 - Mounting support system with installation aid

Title (en)

Mounting support system with installation aid

Title (de)

Montageträgersystem mit Einbauhilfe

Title (fr)

Support de montage avec accessoire de montage

Publication

EP 1088943 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00121185 A

Priority

DE 29917220 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19949839C1] The deformable holding element (35) holds the pressure disk (31) on the anchor (33) in a pre-set design position and consists (35) of a U-spring having legs fixed to the disk and legs joined by a crosspiece thrusting off an endstop (34) on the anchor end so as to hold the disk to the specified endstop (34). Otherwise, holding is effected by a flexible distance piece of spring sheet whose crosspiece thrusts off a radial stop of the anchor (33), or again on a coupling counterpart (12) which is fixed on the projecting anchor end and can be coupled to the coupling element (7) of the connecting element (1). The anchor in this case (33) passes through a hole in the spacer (35) crosspiece so as to force the disk (31) onto the anchor endstop (34). The holding element can again be a flexible sleeve passing round the disk, endstop and/or tie anchor at one end, the sleeve preferably shrunk onto the endstop. In a variant, the holding element is a plate spring structure having conical and adjoining cylindrical sectors bearing on the circumference of the anchor with the conical sector composed of several straps bent radially outwards to go integrally over into the cylindrical sector. The ends of the straps make up a flange to bear on the disk (31). This spring design reaches through the disk bore towards the anchor endstop (34) and is secured there to the tie anchor (33).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/00; E04C 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/00 (2006.01); E04B 5/43 (2006.01); E04C 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/0038 (2013.01); E04B 5/43 (2013.01); E04C 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29917220 U1 20000113; DE 19949839 C1 20001130; EP 1088943 A2 20010404; EP 1088943 A3 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04B 1/00 A

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04C 5/16 B

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI