Global Patent Index - EP 1088944 A2

EP 1088944 A2 2001-04-04 - Joint sealing

Title (en)

Joint sealing

Title (de)

Fugendichtung

Title (fr)

Joint d'étanchéité

Publication

EP 1088944 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118280 A

Priority

  • DE 29917128 U
  • DE 10027142 A

Abstract (en)

The joint seal has a stretchy, corrugated zone (3) formed between two flat strips (1,2). The corrugated zone may have folds, wave formations or a similar profile, and run along the longitudinal axis. The zone may alternatively be formed in an OMEGA shape to form a loop. The sealing band may be formed of a textile or non-woven webbing or of a uniform density material, such as plastics or rubber, and may have a waterproof coating or an impregnation.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Fugendichtung, insbesondere für den Fugenbereich von Fliesenbelägen, Plattenbelägen oder dergleichen, bestehend aus zwei im wesentlichen flachen Streifen (1, 2) zwischen welchen eine dehnfähige, wellenförmige Zone (3) ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/68 (2006.01); E04F 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 15/188 (2013.01); E04B 1/6809 (2013.01); E04B 1/6815 (2013.01); E04F 15/14 (2013.01); E04F 15/142 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088944 A2 20010404; EP 1088944 A3 20020123

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041222

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031008

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI