Global Patent Index - EP 1088945 A2

EP 1088945 A2 2001-04-04 - Insulating element for a facade

Title (en)

Insulating element for a facade

Title (de)

Fassadendämmelement

Title (fr)

Elément d'isolation d'une façade

Publication

EP 1088945 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118845 A

Priority

DE 19946395 A

Abstract (en)

The insulation element (1) is made of a mineral fibre composite and is formed in plates. The element can be covered with plaster (11) and is fixed to the outer facade (8) with insulation holders (6). A marker is arranged on a larger surface to arrange each insulation holder. The markers are spaced form the edges of the plates. The markers may be formed as coloured coatings formed by local heating.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Dämmelement (1) für die Dämmung von Außenfassaden (8) von Gebäuden, insbsondere als Bestandteil eines Wärmedämmverbundsystems, welches plattenförmig ausgebildet und zur Aufnahme eines Putzauftrags (11) geeignet und mittels Dämmstoffhaltern (6) an der Außenfassade (8) befestigbar ist. Um ein derartiges Dämmelement (1) derart weiterzuentwickeln, daß die Verarbeitung bei der Fassadendämmung wesentlich vereinfacht wird, wird vorgeschlagen, zumindest auf einer großen Oberfläche (4) eine Schablone für die Anordnung der Dämmstoffhalter (6) anzuordnen, wobei die Schablone eine der Anzahl der notwendigen Dämmstoffhalter (6) entsprechenden Anzahl von Markierungen (5) aufweist, die beabstandet zu den Rändern angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01); E04B 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/7629 (2013.01); E04B 1/762 (2013.01); E04B 1/7633 (2013.01); E04B 2001/741 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2694319 A1 19940204 - SICOF STE INDLE CALE FACADE [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088945 A2 20010404; EP 1088945 A3 20030115; EP 1088945 B1 20050126; AT 287997 T 20050215; DE 19946395 A1 20010426; DE 19946395 C2 20021128

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009338

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-09-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROCKWOOL INTERNATIONAL A/S, DK

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH + CO OHG, 45966 GLADBECK, DE

- Document: DE 50009338

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50009338

- Representative's name: STENGER WATZKE RING INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, DE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50009338

- Representative's name: STENGER WATZKE RING INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY, DE

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 287997 T

- Effective date: 20110831

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100812

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009338 P 20050303

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030708

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH & CO. OHG

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI