Global Patent Index - EP 1088949 A2

EP 1088949 A2 2001-04-04 - Device for connecting articles in door-, furniture-, glass- or handrail-constructions

Title (en)

Device for connecting articles in door-, furniture-, glass- or handrail-constructions

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von Gegenständen im Tür-, Möbel-, Glas- und Geländerbau

Title (fr)

Dispositif de raccordement d'articles dans la construction de portes, de meubles, de balustrades ou de constructions en verre

Publication

EP 1088949 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118574 A

Priority

  • DE 29915361 U
  • DE 29915362 U
  • DE 29920366 U
  • DE 20006244 U

Abstract (en)

A fitting joins especially the elongated tubular components making up a balcony railing, stair hand rails or similar structure. The fitting consists essentially of two bushes, a first with an outer thread and a second with an inner thread, by means of which their position may be adjusted with respect to each other. One bush is especially cup-shaped.

Abstract (de)

Es handelt sich um eine Vorrichtung (10) zum Verbindung von Gegenständen (12, 14) im Tür-, Möbel-, Glas- oder Geländerbau, wie Zierstäbe, Rohre, Handläufe, Griffstangen, Glasscheiben, Halterungen für diese Gegenstände oder dergleichen, wobei die Vorrichtung (10) wenigstens ein erstes und ein zweites, über korrespondierende Gewindemittel (24, 26) miteinander in Eingriff stehende Bauteile aufweist, die durch relatives Verdrehen axial zueinander verstellbar sind, und das eine Bauteil das andere Bauteil zumindest über einen axialen Teilbereich nach Art einer Hülse (28), topfförmigen Aufnahme oder dergleichen übergreift. Um eine Verbindung ohne sichtbare Verbindungselemente zu ermöglichen, mit der insbesondere der Fertigung- beziehungsweise Bearbeitungsaufwand reduziert ist, ist es vorgesehen, daß eines der Bauteile mittels der Verdrehung mit seinem Gewindemittel (24, 26) auf Gewindemittel (30) aufschraubbar ist, wobei die Gewindemittel (30) an dem zu verbindenden Gegenstand (14) angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/18; F16B 7/14; F16B 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/1817 (2013.01); E04F 11/1804 (2013.01); E04F 11/1851 (2013.01); E04F 11/1838 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088949 A2 20010404; EP 1088949 A3 20020313

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20071219

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040621

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020826

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI