Global Patent Index - EP 1088960 A3

EP 1088960 A3 2001-05-16 - Method and device for moving the arm of a working or life saving apparatus

Title (en)

Method and device for moving the arm of a working or life saving apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bewegung eines Auslegers eines Arbeits- oder Rettungsgeräts

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour positionner le bras d'un appareil de travail ou de sauvetage

Publication

EP 1088960 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00120979 A

Priority

DE 19946411 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1088960A2] The method involves a multiple component movement, e.g. telescopic movement, horizontal rotation and vertical pivoting. The jib is moved from a current starting position to a target position with automatic, simultaneous, smooth and reverse-free movement components, involving approximately constant components over most of the movement path. Independent claims are also included for the following: an arrangement for moving a jib of a working or rescue device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06C 5/04; E06C 5/42; E06C 5/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 11/04 (2006.01); E06C 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06C 5/44 (2013.01); B66F 11/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088960 A2 20010404; EP 1088960 A3 20010516; DE 19946411 A1 20010426

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050614

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040927

2002-03-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR SE

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010928

2002-03-20 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI