Global Patent Index - EP 1088981 A2

EP 1088981 A2 2001-04-04 - Method to decrease the pressure in the common rail of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method to decrease the pressure in the common rail of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Abbau des Raildrucks in einem Common-Rail-System für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Méthode pour decroître la pression dans le rail d'alimentation d'un moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 1088981 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108928 A

Priority

DE 19946908 A

Abstract (en)

The rail pressure regulation method uses a pressure valve and an associated electronic control device, for controlling the valve in dependence on the difference between the required and actual rail pressure within the common-rail fuel injection system, with provision of variable hysteresis limits for the opening and closing of the pressure valve, at least one of which is dependent on the rail pressure.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Abbau des Rail-Drucks in einem Common-Rail-System für Brennkraftmaschinen mittels eines Druck-Abbau-Ventils, das von einer elektronischen Steuerung angesteuert ist, durch die das Druck-Abbau-Ventil abhängig von der Regelabweichung pRail - psoll mit einer Hysteresekennlinie geöffnet oder geschlossen wird. Erfindungsgemäß sind die Hysteresegrenzen für den Öffnungs- und Schließvorgang des Druck-Abbau-Ventils über ein Rechenschema, das in der elektronischen Steuerung abgelegt ist, variabel gestaltet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3863 (2013.01); F02D 2250/31 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088981 A2 20010404; EP 1088981 A3 20020911; DE 19946908 A1 20010405; JP 2001115884 A 20010424

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051122

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050510

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI