Global patent index - EP 1088984 A2

EP 1088984 A2 2001-04-04 - Fuel injection system for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection system for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Einspritzanlage für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'injection pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1088984 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121483 A

Priority

DE 19947063 A

Abstract (en)

The system includes a pump (1) for supplying fuel. Downstream of the pump is a fuel line (7) for supplying at least part of the fuel supplied by the pump to at least one injector (10.1-10.4). A filter element (21) removes gas from the injection system. The filter element is impermeable to fuel and permeable to gas. A venting line branches from the fuel line downstream of the pump, and the filter is arranged in it.

Abstract (de)

Einspritzanlage für eine Brennkraftmaschine, mit einer Pumpe (1) zur Förderung von Kraftstoff, einer der Pumpe (1) stromabwärts nachgeordneten Kraftstoffleitung (7) zur Weiterleitung mindestens eines Teils des von der Pumpe (1) geförderten Kraftstoffs zu mindestens einem Injektor (10.1-10.4) sowie einem Filterelement (21) zur Entfernung von Gas aus der Einspritzanlage, wobei das Filterelement (21) für den Kraftstoff im wesentlich undurchlässig und für Gas im wesentlichen durchlässig ist und von der Kraftstoffleitung stromabwärts nach der Pumpe (1) eine Entlüftungsleitung abzweigt, in der das Filterelement (21) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/00; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 37/20 (2006.01); F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/0047 (2013.01); F02M 37/20 (2013.01); F02M 55/007 (2013.01); F02M 63/0225 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9905410 A1 19990204 - PALL CORP [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088984 A2 20010404; EP 1088984 A3 20040107; EP 1088984 B1 20060503; DE 19947063 A1 20010405; DE 50012683 D1 20060608

INPADOC legal status

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50012683

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-06-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2005-05-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050405

2004-09-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040621

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI