Global Patent Index - EP 1088985 A2

EP 1088985 A2 2001-04-04 - High pressure fuel injector for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

High pressure fuel injector for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Injektor für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit Direkteinspritzung

Title (fr)

Injecteur de carburant pour injection directe dans un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1088985 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121484 A

Priority

DE 19946766 A

Abstract (en)

The injector has an injector body (20) with injector body section (30) and a nozzle body section (40) with an axial bore (50). A fuel delivery bore (60) in the injector body opens into the axial bore. A control piston (70) moves within the axial bore below a control chamber (100) with a relief valve (90). A nozzle needle (80) connected to the piston extends through the axial bore to open and close an injection opening (290). A nozzle spring (160) biases the needle in a seat (170) near the injection opening. The fuel delivery bore opens into a region beneath the control piston in the axial bore and the delivery of fuel to the control chamber from the region of the bore beneath the control piston takes place via a bore (110) in the control piston.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Injektor (10), der einen Injektorkörper (20) umfaßt, welcher einen Injektorkörperabschnitt (30) und einen Düsenkörperabschnitt (40) aufweist, mit einer sich axial erstreckenden Bohrung (50), eine in diese Bohrung (50) mündende Kraftstoffzuführbohrung (60), einen in der axialen Bohrung (50) verlagerbaren Steuerkolben (70), einen Steuerraum (100) oberhalb des Steuerkolbens (70), ein den Steuerraum (100) entlastendes ansteuerbares Ventil (90), eine sich durch die axiale Bohrung (50) erstreckende, mit dem Steuerkolben (70) in Verbindung stehende Düsennadel (80) zum Öffnen und Schließen einer Einspritzdüse, und eine die Düsennadel (80) in einen Nadelsitz (170) im Bereich der Einspritzdüse vorspannende Düsenfeder (160). Bei dem Injektor (10) mündet die Kraftstoffzuführbohrung (60) in einem Bereich unterhalb des Steuerkolbens (70) in die axiale Bohrung (50) und die Zufuhr von Kraftstoff in den Steuerraum (100) aus dem Bereich der axialen Bohrung (50) unterhalb des Steuerkolbens (70) erfolgt durch eine Bohrung (110) im Steuerkolben (70). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 61/10; F02M 61/12; F02M 61/16; F02M 61/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 61/12 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 61/12 (2013.01); F02M 61/168 (2013.01); F02M 61/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1088985 A2 20010404; EP 1088985 A3 20031119; EP 1088985 B1 20060322; DE 19946766 A1 20010426; DE 19946766 C2 20010726; DE 50012433 D1 20060511

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150929

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130929

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130929

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110825 AND 20110831

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012433 P 20060511

2006-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-03-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AUGUSTIN, ULRICH, DR.

2004-12-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BARANOWSKI, DIRK, DR.

2004-12-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRANK, WILHELM

2004-12-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLUEGL, WENDELIN

2004-12-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEWENTZ, GUENTHER

2004-12-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIXL, HEINZ

2004-12-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMUTZLER, GERD, DR.

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040517

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 47/02 A

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/10 B

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/12 B

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/20 B

2003-11-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/16 B

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI