Global patent index - EP 1089032 A2

EP 1089032 A2 2001-04-04 - Method and device for avoiding contamination from a gas pipeline system

Title (en)

Method and device for avoiding contamination from a gas pipeline system

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vermeidung von Verunreinigung von einem Gasrohrnetz

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour éviter la contamination d'une canalisation d'un réseau véhiculant un gaz

Publication

EP 1089032 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00203221 A

Priority

IT MI991966 A

Abstract (en)

Procedure has the following steps: measurement of the pressure in the pipe during shut-down periods, and adjustment of the pressure within the pipe so that it remains between a minimum value, set above 10<5> Pa and a maximum value by introduction of pressurized gas into the pipe or channel as required. The invention also concerns a system for use with the above procedure.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé pour éviter ou minimiser une contamination par une ou plusieurs impuretés gazeuses présentes dans l'atmosphère ambiante, pendant les périodes de temps durant lesquelles un site utilisateur (4) ne consomme pas de gaz, d'une canalisation de gaz véhiculant ce gaz entre une source de gaz (14) et un site utilisateur (4) utilisant ledit gaz. Selon ce procédé, on détermine, pendant ladite période de temps, une valeur de pression (Vpd) correspondant à la pression à l'intérieur d'au moins une portion de ladite canalisation, et on ajuste la pression régnant dans au moins ladite portion de canalisation pour maintenir ladite pression entre une valeur de pression minimale (Vpo) préfixée supérieure à 10<5> Pa et une valeur de pression maximale (Vpm) préfixée supérieure à la valeur de pression minimale (Vpo), le maintien ou l'ajustage de pression étant réalisé par introduction de gaz sous pression dans au moins ladite portion de canalisation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17D 1/04; F17D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17D 1/04 (2006.01); F17D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17D 5/02 (2013.01); F17D 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1089032 A2 20010404; EP 1089032 A3 20020911; EP 1089032 B1 20050223; DE 60018242 D1 20050331; DE 60018242 T2 20060112; ES 2238024 T3 20050816; IT 1313369 B1 20020723; IT MI991966 A1 20010322; IT MI991966 D0 19990922

INPADOC legal status

2012-08-22 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20120415

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090916

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-07-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110714

2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. L'*AIR LIQUIDE A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080811

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-04-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-01-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PRAXAIR, INC.

- Effective date: 20051121

2005-09-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20050223

2005-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2238024

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-05-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050523

2005-03-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60018242

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2005-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB SE

2005-02-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-02-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050223

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040528

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB SE

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI