Global Patent Index - EP 1089036 A1

EP 1089036 A1 2001-04-04 - A reflector having a complex surface for an illumination device of a vehicle

Title (en)

A reflector having a complex surface for an illumination device of a vehicle

Title (de)

Scheinwerfer mit einer komplexen Oberfläche für die Beleuchtungseinrichtung eines Kraftfahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Réflecteur à surface complexe pour un dispositif d'éclairage d'un véhicule

Publication

EP 1089036 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830615 A

Priority

EP 99830615 A

Abstract (en)

A reflector (1) having a complex surface for an illumination device of a vehicle, mountable on the illumination device with its optical axis (3) substantially parallel to a motion plane (4) on which the vehicle moves: the complex reflecting surface (2) of the reflector (1) is constituted by a plurality of elementary sectors (5) having respective elementary reflecting surfaces (6) adjacent one another and joined together along respective adjacent sides (10) to constitute the said complex reflecting surface (2): in the preferred embodiment the elementary sectors (5) are of polygonal shape with four sides (10) and are orientated in such a way that the sides (10) are not parallel to the motion plane (4) but have a predetermined inclination with respect thereto: in comparison with known configurations of comparable dimensions improved photometric performance is obtained. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 7/09; F21W 101/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/09 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1376 (2013.01); F21S 48/23 (2013.01); F21V 7/09 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1089036 A1 20010404; EP 1089036 A9 20010829; EP 1089036 B1 20070228; DE 69935328 D1 20070412; DE 69935328 T2 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091021

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-03-10 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090922

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091008

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070930

2008-01-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VALEO VISION

- Effective date: 20071128

2007-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-06-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070608

2007-04-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69935328 P 20070412

2007-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-02-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 7/09 20060101AFI20060627BHEP

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011003

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI