Global Patent Index - EP 1089039 A1

EP 1089039 A1 2001-04-04 - Electrode comprising an electrode rod

Title (en)

Electrode comprising an electrode rod

Title (de)

Elektrodeneinrichtung mit Elektrodenstab

Title (fr)

Electrode comprenant une baguette d'électrode

Publication

EP 1089039 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119052 A

Priority

DE 19946298 A

Abstract (en)

Electrode rod is made of a composite material reinforced with heat resistant fibers and having a silicon carbide matrix. An Independent claim is also included for an electrode arrangement comprising an electrode (44) for conveying or deviating an electrode voltage from a stub (46), and the electrode rod (32) connected to the stub.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Elektrodenstab (32) angegeben, der aus einem Verbundwerkstoff mit Siliziumcarbid-Matrix besteht, der mit hochwarmfesten Fasern, vorzugsweise mit SiC-Fasern oder mit C-Fasern verstärkt ist. Der Elektrodenstab (32) kann einen mittleren Abschnitt mit quadratischem Querschnitt aufweisen und zwei Endabschnitte, die zylindrisch ausgebildet sind. An einem Endabschnitt (38) kann der Elektrodenstab (32) mit einer Elektrode (44) über einen Spannstift (48) verbunden werden, während am anderen Endabschnitt (40) des Elektrodenstabes (32) ein Isolierrohr (34) befestigt sein kann. Der erfindungsgemäße Elektrodenstab (32) zeichnet sich durch eine gute Langzeitbeständigkeit und geringe Bruchanfälligkeit aus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 3/00; H01T 13/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 3/00 (2006.01); H01T 13/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/39 (2013.01); F23Q 3/008 (2013.01); F23D 2207/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4138434 C1 19921203

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1089039 A1 20010404; EP 1089039 B1 20051116; AT 310211 T 20051215; DE 19946298 A1 20010405; DE 19946298 C2 20020926; DE 50011619 D1 20051222

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50011619

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110902

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101005

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100924

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060902

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-07-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011619

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-12-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2005-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AICHELIN GESMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030617

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR IT

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI