Global Patent Index - EP 1089043 A1

EP 1089043 A1 2001-04-04 - Condenser comprising a reservoir mounted in a removable and tight way on a base

Title (en)

Condenser comprising a reservoir mounted in a removable and tight way on a base

Title (de)

Kondensator mit dicht und lösbar am Anschlussstutzen montiertem Sammler

Title (fr)

Condenseur comprenant un réservoir fixé de manière amovible et étanche sur une embase

Publication

EP 1089043 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402384 A

Priority

FR 9912078 A

Abstract (en)

The cooler for motor vehicle air conditioning has a header (2) screwed axially into the base (20) itself brazed onto the cooler manifold (3). The header is connected to the manifold by ducts (31,32) in the base. Threads (13,24) retain the reservoir which is isolated against contact with the coolant by O-rings (15). A sleeve (40) protects the threads from external conditions.

Abstract (fr)

Le réservoir (2) est vissé axialement dans une embase (20), elle-même brasée sur une boîte collectrice (3) du condenseur. Il communique avec celle-ci par des conduites (31, 32) ménagées dans l'embase. Les filetages (13, 24) servant au vissage du réservoir sont protégés de tout contact avec le fluide réfrigérant par des joints toriques d'étanchéité (15) et des agressions extérieures par un manchon (40) recouvrant extérieurement la zone de jonction entre le réservoir et l'embase. Application à la climatisation de l'habitacle des véhicules automobiles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 39/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/04 (2006.01); F25B 40/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/04 (2013.01); F25B 40/02 (2013.01); F25B 2339/0441 (2013.01); F25B 2339/0446 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1089043 A1 20010404; BR 0004485 A 20010410; FR 2799821 A1 20010420; FR 2799821 B1 20020329; MX PA00009488 A 20021023; US 6301926 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040115

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030704

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI