Global Patent Index - EP 1089045 A2

EP 1089045 A2 2001-04-04 - Articles handling process and rotary hearth furnace therefor

Title (en)

Articles handling process and rotary hearth furnace therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Manipulieren von Werkstücken sowie Drehherdofen hierfür

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le maniement d'articles ainsi qu'un four à sole tournante à cet effet

Publication

EP 1089045 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121081 A

Priority

DE 19947482 A

Abstract (en)

Process for manipulating workpieces to be carburized comprises inserting the workpieces or a workpiece magazine on palettes into a rotary furnace in rows corresponding to a prescribed number of workpiece rows, removing from the furnace after carburizing and feeding to a press. The palettes are arranged in the furnace in the number of rows so that the row number is a multiple of the press number. Preferred Features A free place is provided next to the palettes to be removed from the furnace.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Verfahren zum Manipulieren von aufzukohlenden Werkstücken, bei dem die auf Paletten abgelegten Werkstücke oder Werkstückmagazine in einen Drehherdofen in mehreren, einer vorgegebenen Werkstückreihenzahl entsprechenden Reihen eingebracht, nach dem Aufkohlen dem Drehherdofen entnommen und einer eine vorgegebene Preßstationenzahl aufweisenden Härtepreße zugeführt werden, und wobei auf jeder Palette eine der Preßstationenzahl entsprechende Anzahl von Werkstücken oder Werkstückmagazinen abgelegt wird. Zur besseren Auslastung von Drehherdofen und Härtepresse ist vorgesehen, dass die Paletten im Drehherdofen in einer derartigen Anzahl von Reihen angeordnet werden, dass die Preßstationenzahl ein Teiler der Werkstückreihenzahl ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27D 3/00; C21D 9/00; F27B 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/00 (2006.01); F27B 9/16 (2006.01); F27D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 9/16 (2013.01); C21D 9/0018 (2013.01); C21D 9/0037 (2013.01); F27D 3/0024 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1089045 A2 20010404; EP 1089045 A3 20030716; EP 1089045 B1 20070103; AT 350635 T 20070115; DE 19947482 A1 20010719; DE 19947482 C2 20020711; DE 50013923 D1 20070215; US 6336808 B1 20020108

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50013923

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120928

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 350635 T

- Effective date: 20120928

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110928

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070824

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-08-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-08-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070103

2007-04-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070403

2007-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013923 P 20070215

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2007-01-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041026

2004-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2003-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030825

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI