Global Patent Index - EP 1089058 A1

EP 1089058 A1 2001-04-04 - TWO-DIMENSIONAL ABSOLUTE POSITION SENSOR

Title (en)

TWO-DIMENSIONAL ABSOLUTE POSITION SENSOR

Title (de)

ZWEIDIMENSIONALER ABSOLUTER POSITIONSGEBER

Title (fr)

CAPTEUR DE POSITION ABSOLUE BIDIMENSIONNELLE

Publication

EP 1089058 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99925392 A

Priority

  • JP 9903284 W
  • JP 17345598 A

Abstract (en)

A two-dimensional absolute position sensor comprises at least one magnetic slit thin plate provided to an end-effector which is attached to the end of a robot arm and moves in a plane, and having slits extending in the X and Y directions, magnetic sensor heads having magnetic sensors for position measurement in the X and Y directions opposed to the magnetic slit thin plate through a gap therebetween and bias magnets for applying magnetic fields to the magnetic sensors, and a signal processing circuit for outputting an absolute position signal generated from signals outputted from the magnetic sensors. Therefore, a small-sized, light-weighted two-dimensional absolute position sensor with an excellent environment-resistance used for readily measuring the two-dimensional absolute position of the end-effector of a robot in a non-contact manner can be provided. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01D 5/245; G01B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 7/00 (2006.01); G01D 5/245 (2006.01); G01B 7/30 (2006.01); G01D 5/14 (2006.01); G01D 5/244 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01D 5/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966292 A1 19991223; EP 1089058 A1 20010404; EP 1089058 A4 20061102; JP 2000009492 A 20000114; JP 4239042 B2 20090318; US 6466011 B1 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100105

2008-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080314

2006-11-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01D 5/245 20060101AFI19991229BHEP

2006-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01B 7/00 20060101ALI20060328BHEP

2006-05-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01D 5/14 20060101ALI20060328BHEP

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE