Global Patent Index - EP 1089245 A1

EP 1089245 A1 2001-04-04 - Passive infrared detector

Title (en)

Passive infrared detector

Title (de)

Passiv-Infrarotmelder

Title (fr)

Détecteur infrarouge passif

Publication

EP 1089245 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119496 A

Priority

EP 99119496 A

Abstract (en)

The passive infra red detector system responds to infra red generated by human bodies,or animals, in a room. In order to cover a wide range the emissions are from a wide area are focussed by a multi section mirror (1) onto a sensor (S). The mirror segments (5-8,13,17,16) are formed to provide overlapping sectors.

Abstract (de)

Der Passiv-Infrarotmelder enthält eine wärmeempfindlichen Sensor und ein Fokussiermittel zur Bündelung der aus dem Überwachungsraum auf den Melder fallenden Wärmestrahlung auf den Sensor, wobei das Fokussiermittel Fokussierelemente für Überwachungsbereiche mit unterschiedlicher Lage im Überwachungsraum aufweist. Jedes Fokussierelement besteht aus einer Anzahl von Teilelementen, so dass die Überwachungsbereiche vertikal in Subzonen (51-53, 111-113, 151-154, 171-175) mit leicht unterschiedlicher Elevation aufgespaltet sind. In der Mehrzahl der Überwachungsbereiche überlappen die Subzonen (51-53, 111-113, 151-154, 171-175) einander höchstens geringfügig. Die Unterscheidung zwischen Mensch und Tier erfolgt anhand der Amplitude des Sensorsignals. Die Anzahl der Teilelemente und entsprechend die Anzahl der Subzonen (51-53, 111-113, 151-154, 171-175) nimmt mit abnehmender radialer Entfernung des jeweiligen Überwachungsbereichs vom Melder zu. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/193

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/193 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/193 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6559448 B1 20030506; AT 263402 T 20040415; AT 263403 T 20040415; DE 50005874 D1 20040506; DE 59909044 D1 20040506; DK 1089245 T3 20040712; EP 1089245 A1 20010404; EP 1089245 B1 20040331; ES 2218927 T3 20041116; IL 138059 A 20040725; IL 138059 D0 20011031; PT 1089245 E 20040831

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER AND PEDRAZZINI AG, CH

2016-05-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: VANDERBILT INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2016-03-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: VANDERBILT INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20160224

2016-01-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VANDERBILT INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 80333 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59909044

2016-01-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59909044

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090505

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070928

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2009-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090514 AND 20090520

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2009-04-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071002

2009-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG, INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY

2009-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR#GUBELSTRASSE 22#6300 ZUG (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#WITTELSBACHERPLATZ 2#80333 MUENCHEN (DE)

2008-11-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-11-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-05-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES A.G.

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070912

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR

- Free text: SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG#BELLERIVESTRASSE 36#8034 ZUERICH (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS BUILDING TECHNOLOGIES AG C-IPR#GUBELSTRASSE 22#6300 ZUG (CH)

2006-11-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-24 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20061024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061019

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-17 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20061017

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-10 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20061010

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-06 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061006

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218927 T3

2004-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-08-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040402254

2004-07-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909044 P 20040506

2004-05-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI