Global Patent Index - EP 1089257 A2

EP 1089257 A2 2001-04-04 - Header data formatting for a vocoder

Title (en)

Header data formatting for a vocoder

Title (de)

Kopfdateien Formatierung für einen Sprachkodierer

Title (fr)

Formation de données d'en-tête pour un vocodeur

Publication

EP 1089257 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00121165 A

Priority

US 40918399 A

Abstract (en)

A system controller (106) includes a speech encoder (107) that encodes a low bit rate digital voice message. The speech encoder sets values of words of a header of the encoded message. The values of the words define a quantity of frames in the voice message, N, and define a vocoder rate used for the encoded message. The speech encoder sets a state of each indicator in each frame status field of N frame status fields that are transmitted after the header of the encoded message. The speech encoder assembles N frame data fields, wherein each of the frame data fields comprises a set of data words. The N frame data fields follow the N frame status fields. Each set of data words conforms to at least one of the vocoder rate and the states of the indicators. A decoder (3310) decodes the encoded low bit rate digital message. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 19/14; G08B 3/10; H04L 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/167 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1089257 A2 20010404; EP 1089257 A3 20030122; US 6496798 B1 20021217

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050401

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI