Global Patent Index - EP 1089297 A2

EP 1089297 A2 2001-04-04 - Grid for X-ray absorption

Title (en)

Grid for X-ray absorption

Title (de)

Gitter zur Absorption von Röntgenstrahlung

Title (fr)

Grille pour l'absorption des rayons-x

Publication

EP 1089297 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00203370 A

Priority

DE 19947537 A

Abstract (en)

A mesh consists of comb elements (12) which absorb electromagnetic radiation. The comb slats (11) run laterally with respect to the base that holds them.

Abstract (de)

Ein Gitter (3) mit elektromagnetische Strahlung absorbierenden, zur Gitterbildung dienenden Kammelementen (12), wird zur Erhöhung der Robustheit und der Streustrahlenunterdrückungsqualität dadurch gebildet, dass Kammstege (11) quer zu einer zugehörigen, die Kammstege (11) tragenden Kammbasisfläche verlaufen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21K 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01T 7/00 (2006.01); A61B 6/03 (2006.01); A61B 6/06 (2006.01); G21K 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21K 1/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1089297 A2 20010404; EP 1089297 A3 20040204; EP 1089297 B1 20081015; DE 19947537 A1 20010405; DE 50015401 D1 20081127; JP 2001137234 A 20010522; US 6363136 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110926

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50015401

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110926

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-09-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090716

2008-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015401 P 20081127

2008-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070518

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI