Global Patent Index - EP 1089302 A1

EP 1089302 A1 2001-04-04 - Substrate-mounted common mode choke coil and method of manufacture thereof

Title (en)

Substrate-mounted common mode choke coil and method of manufacture thereof

Title (de)

SMD-Gleichtaktdrosselspule und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (fr)

Bobine d'arrêt de mode commun pour montage en surface et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1089302 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00121450 A

Priority

JP 28007999 A

Abstract (en)

A common mode choke coil has first and second spiral conductive layer elements electrically insulated from each other at a base. The base is made of a magnetic material or a dielectric material. at least one of the first and the second spiral conductive layer elements is formed in close contact with a surface of the base. The common mode choke coil has two spiral conductor layer elements at a base. Therefore, the common mode choke coil may be easily and economically provided that has high Q-characteristics or high impedance at a common mode and little fluctuation of resonance frequencies and inductance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 17/00; H01F 41/04; H01L 23/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/28 (2006.01); H01F 5/00 (2006.01); H01F 17/00 (2006.01); H01F 17/04 (2006.01); H01F 37/00 (2006.01); H01F 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/0033 (2013.01); H01F 41/046 (2013.01); H01F 17/045 (2013.01); H01F 37/00 (2013.01); H01F 2017/0093 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1089302 A1 20010404; CN 1199205 C 20050427; CN 1290947 A 20010411; EP 1347473 A1 20030924; JP 2001102222 A 20010413; KR 20010067263 A 20010712; SG 96573 A1 20030616; TW 508597 B 20021101

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060627

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEC TOKIN CORPORATION

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011220

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI