Global Patent Index - EP 1089321 A1

EP 1089321 A1 2001-04-04 - Ceramic arc tube

Title (en)

Ceramic arc tube

Title (de)

Keramische Bogenröhre

Title (fr)

Tube d'arc en céramique

Publication

EP 1089321 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00119008 A

Priority

US 40881299 A

Abstract (en)

A ceramic arc tube is described which uses a two piece arc tube design requiring only one hermetic joint. The arc tube is made in two sections (2,4) and joined using a lap joint. Because the arc tube body is made in two sections (2,4), each section (2,4) can be produced by conventional ceramic forming techniques. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/361 (2013.01); H01J 61/365 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] US 4387067 A 19830607 - KOBAYASHI KAZUO [JP], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1089321 A1 20010404; CA 2316649 A1 20010329; HU 0003776 A2 20020128; HU 0003776 A3 20021228; JP 2001118543 A 20010427; JP 4709361 B2 20110622

INPADOC legal status


2012-12-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120621

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010507

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI