Global Patent Index - EP 1089382 A2

EP 1089382 A2 2001-04-04 - Coupling device for an electrical connector

Title (en)

Coupling device for an electrical connector

Title (de)

Anschlusskupplung für einen elektrischen Verbinder

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'accouplement pour un connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 1089382 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112257 A

Priority

DE 19937541 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19937541A1] The coupling includes a coupling housing (14) provided on the flexible printed circuit for receiving at least one contact part which can be releasably connected to the flexible circuit. A locking member is provided in the coupling housing for releasably locking the contact part in the coupling housing. An insert (18) is provided at the coupling-side end of the housing from which the contact part protrudes to connect to the electrical conductor. The insert secures the locking member.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anschlußkupplung für einen elektrischen Verbinder zum lösbaren miteinander Kuppeln einer flexiblen gedruckten Schaltung mit mindestens einem elektrischen Leiter. Die Anschlußkupplung weist ein an der flexiblen gedruckten Schaltung vorgesehenes Kupplungsgehäuse zur Aufnahme mindestens eines mit dem elektrischen Leiter lösbar kuppelbaren Kontaktteils auf, das mit der flexiblen gedruckten Schaltung elektrisch leitend verbunden ist. Im Kupplungsgehäuse ist ein Verriegelungselement zum vorzugsweise lösbaren Arretieren des Kontaktteils im Kupplungsgehäuse vorgesehen. Am kupplungsseitigen Ende des Kupplungsgehäuses, aus dem das Kontaktteil zum Verbinden mit dem elektrischen Leiter ragt, ist ein Einsatz zum Sichern des Verriegelungselementes vorzugsweise lösbar befestigbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/77 (2011.01); H01R 12/89 (2011.01); H01R 13/436 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/777 (2013.01); H01R 12/89 (2013.01); H01R 13/4364 (2013.01); H01R 13/4367 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19937541 A1 20010215; EP 1089382 A2 20010404; EP 1089382 A3 20031001

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041106

2004-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI