Global patent index - EP 1089384 A1

EP 1089384 A1 2001-04-04 - Plug connector

Title (en)

Plug connector

Title (de)

Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur à fiche

Publication

EP 1089384 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119098 A

Priority

DE 19945705 A

Abstract (en)

So-called fixed pluggable connectors mounted on circuit boards can transfer a significant part of the tensile forces resulting from tightening up a loose connector on to the circuit board and housing wall, via the contacts, leading to increased tensile forces during operation and reduced quality of contact of the individual contacts. The locking part (36) is provided with at least one hook (42) which is designed to anchor the locking part on the circuit board etc. and can be shifted relative to the housing (24,32) and to the insulator body (10) between two abutments

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Steckverbinder, der Kontakte (12), die an einer Leiterplatte angebracht werden können, einen Isolierkörper, der in dem Gehäuse (24, 32) angeordnet ist und die Kontakte trägt, und mindestens ein Verriegelungsteil (36) enthält, mittels dem ein komplementärer Steckverbinder, der mit einem Kabel versehen sein kann, an dem Steckverbinder verriegelt werden kann, soll verhindert werden, daß auf den Steckverbinder aufgebrachte Zugkräfte auf die Kontakte einwirken. Zu diesem Zweck ist vorgesehen, daß das Verriegelungsteil (36) mit mindestens einem Haken (42) versehen ist, der das Verriegelungsteil (36) an der Leiterplatte etc. verankern kann, und relativ zum Gehäuse und zum Isolierkörper (10) zwischen zwei Anschlägen verschiebbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/70 (2011.01); H01R 13/621 (2006.01); H01R 13/631 (2006.01); H01R 13/73 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/7047 (2013.01); H01R 13/6215 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19945705 A1 20010329; DE 50014580 D1 20071004; EP 1089384 A1 20010404; EP 1089384 B1 20070822; ES 2292392 T3 20080316

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150810

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080526

2008-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2292392

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2008-02-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-11-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20071023

2007-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50014580

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-10-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-08-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARTING ELECTRONICS GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI