Global Patent Index - EP 1089387 A2

EP 1089387 A2 2001-04-04 - A modular female electrical terminal

Title (en)

A modular female electrical terminal

Title (de)

Modulare elektrische Anschlussbuchse

Title (fr)

Borne électrique femelle modulaire

Publication

EP 1089387 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00120233 A

Priority

US 40655899 A

Abstract (en)

A modular female electrical terminal (10) includes a receptacle portion (12) for receiving a male electrical terminal. A first module comprises a base member (16) formed of a first material and having a first thickness. The base member (16) preferably provides the principal current flowpath through the female terminal (10). A second module comprises a cover member (18) which is formed of a second material having a second thickness. The cover member (18) is secured to the base member (16) in a overlying relationship so as to define in cooperation with the base member (16) a cavity (20) suitable for receiving the desired male terminal shape. At least one of the first module or the second module includes means for biasing the male electrical terminal into electrical and frictional contact with the receptacle portion (12) of the terminal (10). A process comprises selecting one of the second module types and securing in to the base member (16). The base member (16) material is preferably selected to provide a higher conductivity and/or a greater thickness than used for the cover member (18). The base member (16) and the cover member (18) may be joined by welding although mechanical interlocking can be employed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/03; H01R 13/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/03 (2006.01); H01R 13/187 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/03 (2013.01); H01R 13/187 (2013.01); H01R 13/113 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1089387 A2 20010404; EP 1089387 A3 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-10-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/03 A, 7H 01R 13/11 B, 7H 01R 13/187 B, 7H 01R 13/115 B

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI