Global Patent Index - EP 1089391 A2

EP 1089391 A2 2001-04-04 - Electrical connector

Title (en)

Electrical connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 1089391 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112255 A

Priority

DE 19937540 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19937540A1] An electrical connector for coupling at least two electric cables, comprises two coupling members (16,20) for the cables (12,14). At least one of the two couplings has an insert (18) which seals the coupling. The insert has a chamber which can be filled with a hardenable sealing material, and the cable runs through it.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen elektrischen Verbinder zum lösbaren Kuppeln mindestens zweier elektrischer Leiter. Der elektrische Verbinder weist zwei lösbar miteinander verbindbare Anschlußkupplungen für die zu kuppelnden elektrischen Leiter auf, wobei an mindestens eine der beiden Anschlußkupplungen ein den betreffenden elektrischen Leiter wenigstens teilweise umschließender Einsatz zum Abdichten der Anschlußkupplung vorzugsweise lösbar befestigbar ist. In dem Einsatz ist mindestens eine mit einer aushärtbaren Dichtungsmasse füllbare Kammer ausgebildet, durch die der elektrische Leiter verläuft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5221 (2013.01); H01R 13/5216 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19937540 A1 20010215; EP 1089391 A2 20010404; EP 1089391 A3 20030702

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-11-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030829

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI