Global Patent Index - EP 1089399 A1

EP 1089399 A1 2001-04-04 - Serial manufacturing procedure for connection elements for female connector and connection element manufactured through that procedure

Title (en)

Serial manufacturing procedure for connection elements for female connector and connection element manufactured through that procedure

Title (de)

Kontaktelementemassenherstellungsverfahren und dadurch Kontaktelement

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication en série d'éléments de connexion pour connexteur femelle et element de connexion obtenu par le procédé

Publication

EP 1089399 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402491 A

Priority

FR 9912198 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves using folded wings to form socket, with additional plate to improve electrical and thermal conduction The connection element is formed using a piece of folded metal with a connection part (3) for attachment to a cable end, and a contact cage (2), connected together by a link piece (4). The contact cage (2) is formed from a base part (6) and two wings (7,8) orthogonal to the base. Between the wings there are two flexible contact lamellae (9,11). A supplementary lamella (12) is provided between the contact lamellae and the base plate, and is fixed rigidly to either the base part of the link piece (4). This supplementary lamella is intended to improve both the electrical and thermal conduction between the contact cage (2) and the link part (4).

Abstract (fr)

Dans cet élément de connexion comprenant au moins une partie de connexion (3) et au moins une cage de contact (2) reliées entre elles par une partie de liaison (4), la cage de contact étant formée d'une partie de base (6) d'un seul tenant avec la partie de liaison (4), et de deux volets (7 et 8) qui sont perpendiculaires à la partie de base (6), et entre lesquels se trouvent deux lames flexibles de contact (9 et 11), il est prévu, pour améliorer la conductibilité électrique et thermique entre la cage de contact (2) et la partie de liaison (4), une lame supplémentaire (12) qui est d'un seul tenant avec la partie de base (6) et repliée sur celle-ci, face contre face, et qui est fixée rigidement à la partie de base (6) ou à la partie de liaison (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1089399 A1 20010404; FR 2799313 A1 20010406; FR 2799313 B1 20011130

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050401

2002-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS FRANCE SAS

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010428

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI