Global Patent Index - EP 1089482 A1

EP 1089482 A1 2001-04-04 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND RECORDED MEDIUM

Title (en)

COMMUNICATION DEVICE, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND RECORDED MEDIUM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR NACHRICHTENÜBERTRAGUNG UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION, PROCEDE DE COMMUNICATION, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT

Publication

EP 1089482 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00915559 A

Priority

  • JP 0002493 W
  • JP 11013599 A

Abstract (en)

Synchronous information indicates a difference ( beta ) between a PCR value E and a counter value N (= 3240000), if the third PCR packet is assumed to arrive at a transmitting apparatus 201 at the time (time t1) the count value N becomes 3240000, on the basis of a difference ( alpha ) between the PCR value E3 and the count value N3, both generated while as many clocks as (count value N3 - reference clock value B) are being counted. Hence, the delay fluctuation generated on a network can be eliminated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 7/00; H04L 12/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04J 3/06 (2006.01); H04N 7/24 (2011.01); H04Q 11/04 (2006.01); H04L 12/70 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/64307 (2013.01); H04J 3/0632 (2013.01); H04N 21/242 (2013.01); H04N 21/4305 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0478 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5664 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1089482 A1 20010404; EP 1089482 A4 20051102; US 2001004366 A1 20010621; US 6347119 B2 20020212; WO 0064092 A1 20001026

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101103

2008-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080320

2005-11-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050919

2005-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 7/00 A

2005-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/56 B

2005-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/62 B

2005-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/24 B

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010104

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE