Global patent index - EP 1089647 A1

EP 1089647 A1 2001-04-11 - FEED SYSTEM FOR SOAP AND LOTION DISPENSER

Title (en)

FEED SYSTEM FOR SOAP AND LOTION DISPENSER

Title (de)

VERSORGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR SEIFE- UND LOTIONSPENDER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION POUR UN DISTRIBUTEUR DE SAVON ET DE LOTION

Publication

EP 1089647 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98931559 A

Priority

US 9813144 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966821A1] A washing system (100) for dispensing a liquid cleanser from a collapsible container (114), with a plurality of dispensers (106), each dispenser having a positive displacement pump (222), a mount for mounting the pump on a dispenser support, and a connection for connecting the pump to a flexible supply line (218), a container support (108) for supporting a collapsible container of liquid cleanser, and a flexible supply line (210) for connecting the collapsible container to each of the pumps, with a one-way valve (124) in the line for blocking fluid flow to the collapsible container while permitting fluid flow from the collapsible container to the dispensers. A secondary reservoir (115) may be provided to permit continued service when the main reservoir is empty or is being replaced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/1205 (2013.01); A47K 5/1204 (2013.01); A47K 2005/1218 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966821A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966821 A1 19991229; AU 755057 B2 20021205; AU 755057 C 20030626; AU 8165998 A 20000110; CA 2336013 A1 19991229; CA 2336013 C 20050510; DE 69821140 D1 20040219; DE 69821140 T2 20041111; EP 1089647 A1 20010411; EP 1089647 B1 20040114

INPADOC legal status

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080623

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080623

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070731

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-04-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040425

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69821140

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-01-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040114

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010103

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT