Global Patent Index - EP 1089705 A1

EP 1089705 A1 2001-04-11 - STICK-SHAPED COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

STICK-SHAPED COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

KOSMETISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN IN STIFTFORM

Title (fr)

PREPARATIONS COSMETIQUES SOUS FORME DE BATON

Publication

EP 1089705 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929214 A

Priority

  • DE 19828020 A
  • EP 9904122 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828020A1] A cosmetic stick composition comprising a mixture of a linear fatty alcohol and 12-hydroxystearic acid, a fatty ketone and/or a fatty ether is used as a thickener for producing cosmetic sticks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/02 (2006.01); A61K 8/33 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/35 (2006.01); A61K 8/365 (2006.01); A61Q 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/0229 (2013.01); A61K 8/02 (2013.01); A61K 8/33 (2013.01); A61K 8/342 (2013.01); A61K 8/35 (2013.01); A61K 8/365 (2013.01); A61Q 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9966895A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828020 A1 19991230; DE 19828020 B4 20051215; EP 1089705 A1 20010411; WO 9966895 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050823

2005-06-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS IP MANAGEMENT GMBH

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040405

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT