Global Patent Index - EP 1089721 A1

EP 1089721 A1 2001-04-11 - PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCT AND METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCT AND METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

PHARMAZEUTISCHES PRODUKT UND VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PRODUIT PHARMACEUTIQUE, PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE REALISATION

Publication

EP 1089721 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99930159 A

Priority

  • US 9912772 W
  • US 9561698 A
  • US 9524698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9963972A1] The present invention provides a product (1) that includes a pharmaceutical unit dosage or diagnostic form (6) that includes at least one active ingredient that is present in an amount that advantageously does not vary by more than about five percent from a predetermined target amount. In one embodiment, the unit form comprises a substrate (8), a deposit (14) that is disposed on the substrate and a cover layer (9) that overlies the deposit and is joined to the substrate by a bond that encircles that deposit, thereby encapsulating it between the substrate and cover substrates. The deposit comprises a powder, at least some of which includes the at least one active ingredient. The unit form is created via a dry powder deposition apparatus that electrostatically deposits the powder on the substrate utilizing an electrostatic chuck and charged powder delivery apparatus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/70; B65B 1/04; B65B 1/30; B65B 11/50; B65D 75/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/14 (2006.01); A61J 3/00 (2006.01); A61K 9/16 (2006.01); A61K 9/51 (2006.01); A61K 9/70 (2006.01); B05B 5/025 (2006.01); B05B 5/16 (2006.01); B65B 1/04 (2006.01); B65B 1/30 (2006.01); B65B 11/50 (2006.01); A61J 1/03 (2006.01); B05B 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/70 (2013.01); A61J 3/00 (2013.01); B65B 1/04 (2013.01); B65B 1/30 (2013.01); B65B 11/50 (2013.01); A61J 1/035 (2013.01); B05B 5/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9963972A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9963972 A1 19991216; WO 9963972 A9 20001012; AU 4675599 A 19991230; AU 763869 B2 20030731; CA 2333107 A1 19991216; CN 1312709 A 20010912; EP 1089721 A1 20010411; HU 0102753 A2 20011128; IL 140087 D0 20020210; JP 2002517304 A 20020618; NZ 508402 A 20030829

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1035139

2004-11-17 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040924

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/70 A

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 1/30 B

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 1/04 B

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65B 11/50 B

2004-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 75/34 B

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SARNOFF CORPORATION

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20001130;SI PAYMENT 20001130