Global Patent Index - EP 1089731 A4

EP 1089731 A4 2003-06-18 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING ELEVATED BLOOD CHOLESTEROL

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING ELEVATED BLOOD CHOLESTEROL

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ERHÖHTEM BLUTCHOLESTEROLSPIEGEL

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE CHOLESTEROLEMIE ELEVEE

Publication

EP 1089731 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99930451 A

Priority

  • GB 9817167 A
  • US 9913887 W
  • US 9052798 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966929A1] The present invention relates to compositions and methods for treating elevated blood cholesterol in a mammal while counteracting the occurrence of potentially adverse side effects such as myopathy. The compositions useful herein comprise the combination of a pharmaceutically effective amount of a 3-hydroxy-3-methylglutaryl coenzyme A reductase inhibitor ("HMG-CoA reductase inhibitor") and a geranylgeraniol compound to a mammal in need thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/405; A61K 31/12; A61K 31/21; A61K 31/35

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/366 (2006.01); A61K 31/045 (2006.01); A61K 31/08 (2006.01); A61K 31/215 (2006.01); A61K 31/216 (2006.01); A61K 31/22 (2006.01); A61K 31/221 (2006.01); A61K 31/351 (2006.01); A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61K 31/404 (2006.01); A61K 31/405 (2006.01); A61K 31/4164 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/443 (2006.01); A61K 31/661 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/221 (2013.01); A61K 31/351 (2013.01); A61K 31/40 (2013.01); A61K 31/404 (2013.01); A61K 31/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 5691375 A 19971125 - BEHOUNEK BRUCE D [US], et al
  • [Y] EP 0671170 A1 19950913 - SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]
  • [Y] US 5622985 A 19970422 - OLUKOTUN ADEOVE Y [US], et al
  • [Y] GB 2055100 A 19810225 - SANKYO CO
  • [A] WO 9719091 A1 19970529 - BALDACCI LAB SPA [IT], et al
  • [Y] FLINT OLIVER P ET AL: "Inhibition of cholesterol synthesis by squalene synthase inhibitors does not induced myotoxicity in vitro.", TOXICOLOGY AND APPLIED PHARMACOLOGY, vol. 145, no. 1, 1997, pages 91 - 98, XP002237082, ISSN: 0041-008X
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 199, no. 809 31 July 1998 (1998-07-31)
  • See also references of WO 9966929A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966929 A1 19991229; AU 4698999 A 20000110; AU 754767 B2 20021121; CA 2335366 A1 19991229; EP 1089731 A1 20010411; EP 1089731 A4 20030618; JP 2002518448 A 20020625

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-06-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030508

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010124;LT PAYMENT 20010124;LV PAYMENT 20010124;MK PAYMENT 20010124;RO PAYMENT 20010124;SI PAYMENT 20010124