Global patent index - EP 1089777 A2

EP 1089777 A2 2001-04-11 - GAS OUTLET BARREL RETENTION APPARATUS

Title (en)

GAS OUTLET BARREL RETENTION APPARATUS

Title (de)

HALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN GAS-AUSLASS-ZYLINDER

Title (fr)

APPAREIL A RETENUE DE CYLINDRE DE SORTIE DE GAZ

Publication

EP 1089777 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99930497 A

Priority

  • US 9913973 W
  • US 9055398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9966968A2] A gas outlet apparatus (10) is configured to provide a medical gas outlet for a gas supply line (62). The apparatus (10) includes a front cover (12) formed to include a gas outlet opening (14), a back plate (24) coupled to the front cover (12), and a gas outlet barrel (30) having an inlet end, an outlet end (80), and a valve located between the inlet end and the outlet end (80). The apparatus (10) also includes a retention portion located on the back plate (24). The retention portion is configured to engage the barrel (30) adjacent the outlet end (80) to secure the barrel (30) to the back plate (24) and the cover (12) and with the outlet end (80) of the barrel (30) in alignment with the gas outlet opening (14) formed in the front cover (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 5/00; F16L 37/00; F16L 37/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16L 5/00 (2006.01); A61M 16/00 (2006.01); F16L 37/00 (2006.01); F16L 37/24 (2006.01); F16L 37/26 (2006.01); F16L 37/60 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A61M (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16L 37/60 (2013.01); Y10T 137/6184 (2015.04); Y10T 137/6195 (2015.04); Y10T 137/698 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9966968 A2 19991229; WO 9966968 A3 20000615; AT 354760 T 20070315; AU 4702999 A 20000110; CA 2334685 A1 19991229; CA 2334685 C 20080902; DE 69935222 D1 20070405; DE 69935222 T2 20071025; EP 1089777 A2 20010411; EP 1089777 A4 20040519; EP 1089777 B1 20070221; JP 2002518654 A 20020625; JP 4492835 B2 20100630; US 6347643 B1 20020219

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-09-12 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20140806

2014-09-12 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BEACONMEDAES LLC., US

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20140806

2014-03-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BEACONMEDAES LLC (N.D.GES.D. STAATES DELAWARE), US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69935222

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-03-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BEACONMEDAES LLC (N.D.GES.D. STAATES DELAWARE), US

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69935222

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-03-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69935222

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WABLAT, WOLFGANG, DIPL.-CHEM. DR.-ING. DR.JUR., DE

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-02-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69935222

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WABLAT, WOLFGANG, DIPL.-CHEM. DR.-ING. DR.JUR., DE

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070621

2008-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071122

2007-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2007-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69935222

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-04-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL

2007-02-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-02-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070221

2007-02-21 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070221

2007-02-21 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070221

2007-02-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070221

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050427

2005-02-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BEACON MEDICAL PRODUCTS LLC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040402

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 16L 5/00 A

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 16L 37/60 B

2004-05-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 16L 37/00 B

2003-11-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEDAES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 16L 5/00 A

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL