Global patent index - EP 1089855 A1

EP 1089855 A1 2001-04-11 - PNEUMATIC IMPACT MECHANISM WITH A DRIVE PISTON HAVING A REDUCED WALL THICKNESS

Title (en)

PNEUMATIC IMPACT MECHANISM WITH A DRIVE PISTON HAVING A REDUCED WALL THICKNESS

Title (de)

LUFTFEDERSCHLAGWERK MIT ANTRIEBSKOLBEN MIT GERINGER WANDSTÄRKE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PERCUSSION PNEUMATIQUE AVEC PISTON D'ENTRAINEMENT A FAIBLE EPAISSEUR DE PAROI

Publication

EP 1089855 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99931180 A

Priority

  • DE 19828426 A
  • EP 9904415 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828426A1] The invention relates to a pneumatic impact mechanism for a paving breaker and/or hammer drill which is characterized by a drive piston (1) having air equalization slits (5) and an extremely reduced wall thickness of the guide sleeve (1a) thereof. This leads to a distinct reduction of the vibrations during the no-load operation of the impact mechanism, whereby advantageous characteristics of the impact mechanism with regard to wear behavior and compactness can be retained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 11/00; B25D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 11/12 (2006.01); B25D 11/00 (2006.01); B25D 17/00 (2006.01); B25D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 11/005 (2013.01); B25D 17/00 (2013.01); B25D 2211/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967064A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828426 A1 20000113; DE 19828426 C2 20030403; EP 1089855 A1 20010411; EP 1089855 B1 20020410; ES 2174622 T3 20021101; JP 2002518197 A 20020625; JP 4862124 B2 20120125; US 6237700 B1 20010529; WO 9967064 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130624

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59901204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59901204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59901204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-02-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20120208

2011-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2009-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030113

2003-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WACKER-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG TRANSFER- WACKER CONSTR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2003-01-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-12-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2174622

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-10-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-16

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-04-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000607

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE