Global Patent Index - EP 1089857 A1

EP 1089857 A1 2001-04-11 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING FIBRE CEMENT PANELS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING FIBRE CEMENT PANELS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FASERZEMENT-PLATTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PLAQUES EN FIBROCIMENT

Publication

EP 1089857 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926188 A

Priority

  • AT 9900159 W
  • AT 108698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9967071A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for producing fibre cement panels or moulded bodies or such like. The method provided for by the invention comprises the following steps: production of a fibre suspension from a binder which contains cement and in which cellulose fibres or similar fibres are distributed; dilution of the fibre suspension with water to a predefined concentration of solids; transfer of the diluted fibre suspension into at least one perforated cylinder box (6a, 6b), whereby the filling level of said perforated cylinder box (6a, 6b) is adjusted to a set value; application of the diluted fibre suspension onto a perforated cylinder drum (7a, 7b) located in the perforated cylinder box; transfer of the fibre-suspension layer formed on the perforated cylinder drum (7a, 7b) onto a felt strip (8); drying and pressing of the layer positioned on the felt strip (8); removal of the layer from the felt strip (8) for the production of panels or moulded bodies; measurement of the thickness of the layer removed from the felt strip; and adjustment of the bulk density of the suspension supplied to the perforated cylinder box (6a, 6b). Improved control over panel thickness is obtained by modifying the set value of the filling level of at least one perforated cylinder box (6a, 6b) in accordance with the measured thickness of the layer removed from the felt strip (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 1/42; B28B 1/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/42 (2006.01); B28B 1/52 (2006.01); B28B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/42 (2013.01); B28B 1/527 (2013.01); B28B 17/0072 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967071A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9967071 A1 19991229; AT 224795 T 20021015; AT 409944 B 20021227; AT A108698 A 20020515; AU 4353799 A 20000110; DE 59902858 D1 20021031; EP 1089857 A1 20010411; EP 1089857 B1 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100617

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100617

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VOITH PAPER PATENT G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090617

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: NOVAGRAAF INTERNATIONAL SA

2002-11-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902858 20021031

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224795 T 20021015

2002-05-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-02-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING FIBRE CEMENT PANELS

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IE LI