Global Patent Index - EP 1089866 A1

EP 1089866 A1 2001-04-11 - PROCESS TO PREPARE A POLYMER NANOCOMPOSITE COMPOSITION

Title (en)

PROCESS TO PREPARE A POLYMER NANOCOMPOSITE COMPOSITION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER POLYMER-NANOKOMPOSITZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'ELABORATION D'UNE COMPOSITION POLYMERE NANOCOMPOSITE

Publication

EP 1089866 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99908144 A

Priority

  • US 9903097 W
  • US 7463998 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9941060A1] A process to prepare a polymer nanocomposite composition comprising forming a flowable mixture of a polyamide and a silicate material; dissociating at least about 50 % but not all of said silicate material; and subjecting the polyamide in the dissociated mixture to solid state polymerization to form the nanocomposite.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29D 22/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 77/00 (2006.01); C08F 2/44 (2006.01); C08G 85/00 (2006.01); C08J 5/00 (2006.01); C08K 3/34 (2006.01); C08K 9/04 (2006.01); C08K 9/08 (2006.01); C08L 51/06 (2006.01); C08L 53/00 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B82Y 30/00 (2013.01); C08J 5/005 (2013.01); C08K 3/34 (2013.01); C08K 9/08 (2013.01); C08J 2377/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08K 3/34 + C08L 77/00
  2. C08K 9/08 + C08L 77/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9941060 A1 19990819; AU 2764599 A 19990830; BR 9907895 A 20011226; CA 2320909 A1 19990819; CN 1297401 A 20010530; EP 1089866 A1 20010411; EP 1089866 A4 20020925; JP 2002502913 A 20020129; KR 20010040965 A 20010515; MX PA00007913 A 20020301; MX PA00011151 A 20010701

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021027

2002-09-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 29D 22/00 A, 7C 08K 3/34 B, 7C 08K 9/08 B, 7C 08G 69/04 B, 7C 08K 9/04 B, 7C 08F 2/44 B

2002-01-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL