Global Patent Index - EP 1089873 A1

EP 1089873 A1 2001-04-11 - ELASTIC MEMBER AND DISPOSABLE GARMENT HAVING IMPROVED FITNESS TO BODY DURING ENTIRE USE

Title (en)

ELASTIC MEMBER AND DISPOSABLE GARMENT HAVING IMPROVED FITNESS TO BODY DURING ENTIRE USE

Title (de)

ELASTISCHER STREIF UND WEGWERFKLEIDUNGSSTÜCK MIT VERBESSERTER PASSFORM NACH LANGE GEBRAUCH

Title (fr)

ELEMENT ELASTIQUE ET VETEMENT JETABLE S'ADAPTANT AU CORPS DE MANIERE PERFECTIONNEE PENDANT TOUTE LA DUREE D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 1089873 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98913126 A

Priority

US 9805895 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9948680A1] The present invention is directed to an elastic member, comprising an elastomeric material having a first surface and a second surface opposing the first surface, and a first coverstock layer which is joined to the first surface of the elastomeric material, wherein the elastomeric material has a Retention Force Held after 12 hours at 50 % extension (RFH12H) of at least about 40 g/inch. The present invention is also directed to a disposable garment, comprising a chassis having a front region, a back region and a crotch region between the front region and the back region; at least one pair of side panels extending laterally outwardly from the chassis in the front or back region; and at least one of the side panels comprising an elastomeric material extending laterally outwardly from the chassis; wherein the elastomeric material has a Retention Force Held after 12 hours at the 50 % extension (RFH12H) of at least about 40 g/inch. The chassis comprises a liquid pervious topsheet, a liquid impervious backsheet associated with the topsheet, and an absorbent core disposed between the topsheet and the backsheet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 7/02; A61F 13/15; B32B 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/49 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01); A61F 13/56 (2006.01); A61F 13/72 (2006.01); B32B 5/26 (2006.01); B32B 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/49015 (2013.01); B32B 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948680A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9948680 A1 19990930; WO 9948680 A8 20010222; AR 023019 A1 20020904; AU 6774798 A 19991018; BR 9815767 A 20001121; CA 2325696 A1 19990930; CN 1291133 A 20010411; EG 21720 A 20020227; EP 1089873 A1 20010411; HU 0101410 A2 20010928; HU 0101410 A3 20011029; IL 138234 D0 20011031; JP 2000510403 A 20000815; PE 05362000 A1 20000804; TR 200002754 T2 20001221; TW 504380 B 20021001; ZA 9902260 B 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020726

2001-08-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REZAI, EBRAHIM

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WANG, LIN

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHO, EUI-BOO C/O YOSHIO OHMOTO

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE