Global Patent Index - EP 1089882 A2

EP 1089882 A2 2001-04-11 - METHOD FOR MARKING PAPER AND PAPERBOARD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MARKING PAPER AND PAPERBOARD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR MARKIERUNG VON PAPIEREN UND KARTONS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR MARQUER DES PAPIERS ET DES CARTONS

Publication

EP 1089882 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99924958 A

Priority

  • DE 19822605 A
  • EP 9903286 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19822605A1] To form a durable marking in the top layer of paper substrates, at least one of the lower layers is treated with laser energy before the top layer is applied. The top layer is opaque using a printing and/or at least a varnish and/or at least a metallizing or combinations of them. A coating is directly under the top paper layer, which has no pigments or contains white or colored pigments. The coating is calendered and can also be varnished. The same process can be used with layers of thicker fiber webs, of natural fibers, to give a cardboard product. The laser energy metallizes the surface to take printing and/or a varnish. The lower layer surface is treated with a carbon dioxide laser. The metallizing process uses copper, aluminum, gold or silver. The marking is a logo, name, trade mark, an image, or a security marking. The paper substrate is in a weight of 40-400 g/m<2>.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/26; D21H 19/82; D21H 25/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 1/36 (2006.01); B41M 7/00 (2006.01); D21F 1/44 (2006.01); D21H 25/06 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01); D21H 19/08 (2006.01); D21H 19/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 25/06 (2013.01); D21F 1/44 (2013.01); B41M 5/26 (2013.01); D21H 19/08 (2013.01); D21H 19/82 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960208A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822605 A1 19991125; DE 19822605 C2 20030417; AU 4142899 A 19991206; EP 1089882 A2 20010411; EP 1089882 B1 20020313; WO 9960208 A2 19991125; WO 9960208 A3 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59900991

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120512

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120512

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120512

2012-08-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: REFLEX PREMIUM PAPIER GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59900991

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120702

2012-08-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59900991

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: FLEISCHER, GODEMEYER, KIERDORF & PARTNER, PATE, DE

- Effective date: 20120702

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120503

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59900991

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: FLEISCHER, GODEMEYER, KIERDORF & PARTNER, PATE, DE

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110607

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900991

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-18

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001109

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT