Global Patent Index - EP 1089925 A1

EP 1089925 A1 2001-04-11 - COUPLING PIECE FOR CONNECTING TWO CONTAINERS STACKED ONE ON TOP OF THE OTHER

Title (en)

COUPLING PIECE FOR CONNECTING TWO CONTAINERS STACKED ONE ON TOP OF THE OTHER

Title (de)

KUPPELSTÜCK ZUR VERBINDUNG ZWEIER AUFEINANDER GESTAPELTER CONTAINER

Title (fr)

PIECE D'ACCOUPLEMENT POUR L'ASSEMBLAGE DE DEUX CONTENEURS SUPERPOSES

Publication

EP 1089925 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936395 A

Priority

  • DE 9901627 W
  • DE 29811460 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0000413A1] The invention relates to a coupling piece (5) for connecting two containers (2, 4) stacked one on top of the other. The coupling piece connects the two containers by their corner fittings (1, 3), which have elongated holes. Coupling projections (7) which protrude in opposite directions to each other are provided so that the coupling piece can be inserted and locked into the elongated holes or corner fittings of the containers. A blocking stop is allocated to one of these coupling projections (7) and can be introduced into the elongated hole of the same corner fitting. The aim of the invention is to provide a coupling piece of this type which is configured in such a way that the stacked containers can be additionally secured with a lock rod on the corner fitting of the top container. To this end, the coupling projection to which the blocking stop is allocated only has projections which protrude sideways.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/0013 (2013.01); B65D 90/0006 (2013.01); B65D 2590/0016 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000413A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CY DE DK FR GB GR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29811460 U1 19980917; CN 1307534 A 20010808; DK 1089925 T3 20020521; EP 1089925 A1 20010411; EP 1089925 B1 20020206; WO 0000413 A1 20000106

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050101

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-01-31 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-01-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050105

2005-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SHIP'S EQUIPMENT CENTRE BREMEN G.M.B.H. *SEC

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040630

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030602

2003-12-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031231

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031230

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-23 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20031223

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031219

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-12 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031212

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030602

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-09-06 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020401725

2002-07-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-30 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20020630

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-06-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-05-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900846 20020321

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CY DE DK FR GB GR IT NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001212

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CY DE DK FR GB GR IT NL