Global Patent Index - EP 1089932 A1

EP 1089932 A1 2001-04-11 - FEEDING DEVICE

Title (en)

FEEDING DEVICE

Title (de)

ANLEGEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN PLACE

Publication

EP 1089932 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929148 A

Priority

  • DE 19827635 A
  • EP 9903927 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827635A1] The assembly to lay a number of continuous yarns simultaneously at the bobbin sleeves, held in a bobbin winder, has a carrier arm (1e) where the yarn guides (2a-2p) for each yarn slide along it. The carrier arm (1e) has at least one system to slide the yarn guides (2a-2p) parallel to the bobbin holder, and to position them at defined intervals. At least one sliding mechanism has a guide rod (5,6) where the yarn guides (2a-2p) slide along it. At least one sliding mechanism has draw rods to position neighboring yarn guides (2a-2p) at intervals between a min. and a max. value. The draw rods have carriers and/or positioning units in both directions of yarn guide movement along the guide rods (5,6). One of the two outer yarn guides (2h,2i) at the guide rods (5,6) is locked to the guide rod, while the outer yarn guides (2a,2p) at the opposite ends of the guide rods (5,6) are moved along the rods by the sliding mechanism. The sliding mechanism is a double-action piston/cylinder unit, with two units at the carrier arm (1e) in a mirror image array. One of the sliding mechanisms forms a component unit with the fixed yarn guides (2h,2i) at the guide rods (5,6). The yarn guides have a holder opening to lay the yarns.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/20 (2006.01); B65H 57/26 (2006.01); B65H 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 57/003 (2013.01); B65H 57/26 (2013.01); B65H 65/00 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967165A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827635 A1 19991223; CN 1305431 A 20010725; EP 1089932 A1 20010411; EP 1089932 B1 20021002; JP 2002518278 A 20020625; US 6543714 B1 20030408; WO 9967165 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-06-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050608

2004-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-07-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040723

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040629

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902956 20021107

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZENTES UNITEX TEXTILE MACHINERY GMBH & CO.KG

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020304

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001219

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL