Global Patent Index - EP 1089933 A1

EP 1089933 A1 2001-04-11 - YARN CHANGING METHOD

Title (en)

YARN CHANGING METHOD

Title (de)

FADENCHANGIERUNG

Title (fr)

CHANGEMENT DE FIL

Publication

EP 1089933 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99923364 A

Priority

  • CH 9900253 W
  • CH 127898 A
  • CH 226798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9965810A1] The invention relates to a yarn-guide of a winding frame (1), which has the form of a pointer, hereafter referenced to as a pointer, and which is reduced in weight and shape towards its free end in order to enable a change of yarn (F) within a traverse yarn winding (H) at a high speed. In a preferred embodiment, a polynomial of at least one degree is used. In addition, the yarn is guided on a guide plate (6). The motor (8) is controlled by a control unit (12) so that the pointer (7) can be used for guiding the yarn (F) within the traverse yarn winding (H). Also, when the pointer stops in a position (C) within the traverse yarn winding (H) an end bead is formed on a ready-made spool and, when the pointer stops in a position (A or B) outside the limits of the traverse yarn winding (H), the yarn is grasped in position (A ) by a new core when it is drawn in (8) during changing of the spool, whereas in position (B) the yarn is wound on said core to form a yarn reserve winding before it is driven back once again within the traverse (H) by the pointer. The control unit and the motor co-operate to reverse the pointer at a selected reverse point. For that purpose, a reverse means operates in a contactless manner, e.g. electromagnetically.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/28; B65H 54/34; B65H 57/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/28 (2006.01); B65H 54/34 (2006.01); B65H 57/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2827 (2013.01); B65H 54/2884 (2013.01); B65H 54/34 (2013.01); B65H 57/003 (2013.01); B65H 57/006 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965810A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9965810 A1 19991223; AU 4028699 A 20000105; DE 59907306 D1 20031113; EP 1089933 A1 20010411; EP 1089933 B1 20031008; JP 2002518276 A 20020625; US 6505791 B1 20030114

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150610

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140617

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907306

- Effective date: 20140101

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-01-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110101

2010-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK *RIETER A.G.

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090616

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-05-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040526

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907306 P 20031113

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL

2003-10-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KUPRAT, HEIKE

2003-10-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHAAD, MARC

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020723

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL