Global Patent Index - EP 1089935 A1

EP 1089935 A1 2001-04-11 - HOIST DRIVE

Title (en)

HOIST DRIVE

Title (de)

HEBEZEUGANTRIEB

Title (fr)

ENTRAINEMENT POUR APPAREIL ELEVATEUR

Publication

EP 1089935 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929286 A

Priority

  • DE 19828213 A
  • EP 9904262 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828213A1] A compact motor unit for a lift has a stepped planetary gearing (5) to provide a gear ratio of up to 20:1. The gearing is mounted inside the outer drive wheel (12) which is fitted onto an output drive (10) supported by bearings (17) on the fixed component (6) of the gearing. The fixed component is bolted to the motor housing. The output drive includes an outer plate (4) which supports the planetary stage. The gearing is driven directly off the motor shaft (15) and the other end of the motor unit has the safety brake (11) mounted directly onto the motor shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66D 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9967168A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828213 A1 19991230; AU 4613799 A 20000110; CN 1092134 C 20021009; CN 1301233 A 20010627; EP 1089935 A1 20010411; EP 1089935 B1 20020904; ES 2179661 T3 20030116; WO 9967168 A1 19991229

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110620

2012-07-17 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120717

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100713

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT# #88038 FRIEDRICHSHAFEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT# #88038 FRIEDRICHSHAFEN (DE)

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179661 T3

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902580 20021010

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES LI

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011221

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000908

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES LI