Global Patent Index - EP 1089983 A1

EP 1089983 A1 2001-04-11 - SUBSTITUTED 2,4-DIAMINO-1,3,5-TRIAZINES, METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES AND PLANT GROWTH REGULATORS

Title (en)

SUBSTITUTED 2,4-DIAMINO-1,3,5-TRIAZINES, METHODS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES AND PLANT GROWTH REGULATORS

Title (de)

SUBSTITUIERTE 2,4-DIAMINO-1,3,5-TRIAZINE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS HERBIZIDE UND PFLANZENWACHSTUMSREGULATOREN

Title (fr)

2,4-DIAMINO-1,3,5-TRIAZINES SUBSTITUEES, PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE LES PREPARER ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME HERBICIDES ET REGULATEURS DE CROISSANCE POUR VEGETAUX

Publication

EP 1089983 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99931049 A

Priority

  • DE 19828519 A
  • EP 9903987 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19828519A1] Substituted 2,4-diamino-1,3,5-triazine derivatives (I) are new. Triazines of formula (I) and their salts are new. Ar = 5-14 membered mono- or bicyclic aryl, optionally containing 1-4 heteroatoms; Y = O, S, NR11, NR12CONR13, COO, OCOO, OCONR14, SO, SO2, SO2O, OSO2O or SO2NR14; m = 0-3; n = 1-4, provided that n is not 1 if m = 0 and Y = O, S, SO, SO2 or NR9; R1, R2 = G1; R3-R6 = G2; or R6 may also be heterocyclyl; G1 = H, alkyl, alkenyl, alkynyl, alkoxy, cycloalkyl, cycloalkoxy, arylalkyl or cycloalkylalkyl; G2 = as G1; or alkylthio, alkylsulfinyl, alkylsulfonyl, aryl, arylalkoxy, cycloalkylalkoxy, cycloalkoxyalkoxy, cycloalkoxyalkyl or cycloalkylalkoxy; or CR1R2, CR3R4 or CR5R6 = CO, CR15R16 or Cyc; or two R1, two R3 or R3 + R5 = group completing Cyc; Cyc = 3-6 membered ring; R7 = H, NH2, alkylcarbonyl, mono- or dialkylamino, acyclic or cyclic hydrocarbyl, acyclic or cyclic hydrocarbyloxy, heterocyclyl, heterocyclyloxy or heterocyclylamino; R8 = alkyl, alkenyl, alkynyl, cycloalkyl, cycloalkoxy or heterocyclyl; R9, R10 = H, NH2, alkylcarbonyl, mono- or dialkylamino, alkyl, cycloalkyl, alkoxy, cycloalkoxy, heterocyclyl, heterocyclyloxy or heterocyclylamino; or NR9R10 = heterocycle; R11 = H, NH2, mono- or dialkylamino, alkyl, cycloalkyl, cycloalkylalkyl, alkoxy, alkoxyalkoxy, cycloalkoxy or alkylcarbonyl; R12, R13 = H, alkyl, alkenyl, alkynyl, Ph, phenylalkyl, cycloalkyl or cycloalkylalkyl; or R12 + R13 = group completing a ring; R14 = H, alkyl or cycloalkyl; R15, R16 = H, aryl, alkoxy, arylalkyl, alkyl or alkylthio; or CR15R16 = ring. The full definitions are given in the DEFINITIONS (Full Definitions) field.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 251/18; A01N 43/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/68 (2006.01); C07D 251/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/68 (2013.01); C07D 251/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000480A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828519 A1 19991230; AR 019874 A1 20020320; AU 4771099 A 20000117; BG 105071 A 20011031; BR 9912219 A 20010424; CA 2336057 A1 20000106; CN 1306519 A 20010801; EP 1089983 A1 20010411; HU 0102832 A2 20011128; HU 0102832 A3 20020328; ID 29562 A 20010906; IL 140474 D0 20020210; JP 2002519345 A 20020702; PL 345277 A1 20011203; SK 20152000 A3 20010611; TR 200003607 T2 20010420; US 2003186817 A1 20031002; WO 0000480 A1 20000106; ZA 200006520 B 20010705

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040706

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040224

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HOLLANDER, JENS

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WILLMS, LOTHAR

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ZINDEL, JUERGEN

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MINN, KLEMENS

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GIENCKE, WOLFGANG

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROSINGER, CHRISTOPHER

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AULER, THOMAS

2001-05-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BIERINGER, HERMANN

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20010126